EP0605659 - PROCESS FOR BONDING CARBONACEOUS BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTENDORF, Donald, L. 1136 East Hope Mesa, AZ 85203 / US | 02 /
WEST, Gary, Allen 122 Lozier Road Budd Lake, New Jersey 07828 / US | [1995/10] |
Former [1994/28] | 01 /
MITTENDORF, Donald, L. 1136 East Hope Mesa, AZ 85203 / US | ||
02 /
WEST, Gary, Allen 18 Blakely Avenue Dover, NJ 07801 / US | Representative(s) | Poidatz, Emmanuel Ing. E.C.I. Diplomé du C.P.A. Conseil en Brevets d'Invention, 96, Boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Poidatz, Emmanuel Ing. E.C.I. Diplomé du C.P.A. Conseil en Brevets d'Invention 96, Boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93906307.9 | 23.09.1992 | [1994/28] | WO1992US08063 | Priority number, date | US19910766466 | 26.09.1991 Original published format: US 766466 | [1994/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306061 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0605659 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605659 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/00 | [1994/28] | CPC: |
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B37/006 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,US);
C04B2237/12 (EP,US);
C04B2237/125 (EP,US);
C04B2237/363 (EP,US);
C04B2237/55 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/52 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4531, C04B41/515 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/455, C04B41/5105 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON KOHLEBAUTEILEN | [1994/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR BONDING CARBONACEOUS BODIES | [1994/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE DE CORPS CARBONES | [1994/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 02.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2198909 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US3717926 (DERGUNOVA V, et al); | [A]EP0067252 (ADVANCED TECH INC [US]); | [A]EP0357124 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |