EP0586654 - BREAKING MACHINE, ESPECIALLY AN IMPACT CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krupp Fördertechnik GmbH Altendorfer Strasse 120 45143 Essen / DE | [1997/13] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states Krupp Fördertechnik GmbH Franz-Schubert-Strasse 1-3 D-47226 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALT, Günter Abt-Fulrad-Str. 2 D-6601 Kleinbittersdorf 1 / DE | [1994/11] | Application number, filing date | 93906529.8 | 15.03.1993 | [1994/11] | WO1993EP00591 | Priority number, date | DE19924210809 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4210809 | [1994/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319847 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586654 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586654 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B02C13/09 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
B02C13/095 (EP,US);
B02C13/282 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | ZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE PRALLBRECHER | [1994/11] | English: | BREAKING MACHINE, ESPECIALLY AN IMPACT CRUSHER | [1994/11] | French: | MACHINE DE CONCASSAGE ET, PLUS PARTICULIEREMENT, CONCASSEUR A PERCUSSION | [1994/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 14.08.1997 | [2015/21] |
Former [1998/10] | BE | 14.05.1997 | |
PT | 14.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 14.08.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE681032 (NORDBERG MANUFACTURING CO); | [Y]DE2109161 ; | [X]AU448539B ; | [A]DE2516014 (HAZEMAG ANDREAS KG); | [Y]GB2020574 (VOEST ALPINE AG); | [Y]GB2072531 (HAZEMAG ANDREAS KG); | [A]DE3939598 (GRONHOLZ CLAUS [DE]); | [Y]GB2230475 (DRESSER UK LTD [GB]) |