EP0725724 - METHOD OF PRODUCING FOAMED PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSITRON UK LIMITED 107 Bell Street London NW1 6TA / GB | [1999/40] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states ISOFLAM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 91-93, Pirbright Road Southfields, London SW18 5ND / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARKAS, Robert 62 Havers Lane Bishops Stortford, Hetfordshire CM23 3PD / GB | 02 /
WINNINGTON-INGRAM, Edward Nicholas 3 Pound Farm Road Chichester, West Sussex PO19 2LX / GB | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/17] | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB | ||
Former [1996/33] | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93906743.5 | 24.03.1993 | [1996/33] | WO1993GB00606 | Priority number, date | GB19920006573 | 26.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9206573 | EP19920309531 | 19.10.1992 Original published format: EP 92309531 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318909 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725724 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725724 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/00, C08J9/14 | [1999/10] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1996/33] | B29C67/22, C08J9/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHAUMPLATTEN AUS PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE | [1996/33] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING FOAMED PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE PANELS | [1996/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PANNEAUX EN PHENOL-FORMALDEHYDE EXPANSE | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.1995 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.1995 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.1995 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | 09.02.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.02.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   24.02.1995 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1999 | CH | 28.07.1999 | ES | 28.07.1999 | GR | 28.07.1999 | IT | 28.07.1999 | LI | 28.07.1999 | SE | 28.07.1999 | DK | 28.10.1999 | PT | 28.10.1999 | GB | 24.03.2000 | IE | 24.03.2000 | LU | 24.03.2000 | BE | 31.03.2000 | FR | 31.03.2000 | [2008/41] |
Former [2008/05] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
IT | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
LU | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
LU | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
IE | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
GB | 24.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
CH | 04.11.1999 | ||
LI | 04.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 28.07.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1162829 ; | [A]FR2124185 (TARDY JAMES [FR]); | [A]DE2327314 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [Y]BE840923 (G.M.T. S.A. [FR]); | [A]GB2085886 (KOPPERS CO INC); | [Y]US4539338 (CARLSON JOHN D [US], et al); | [Y]EP0276430 (ISOBLOC GMBH [DE], et al) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB AN 86-012362 [02]; DW 8602 & SU-A-1162829 (TEPLOPROEKT) 23 June 1985, & SU1162829 A 00000000 |