EP0587913 - LIQUID-CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE WITH ADDRESSING SCHEME TO ACHIEVE HIGH CONTRAST AND HIGH BRIGHTNESS VALUES WHILE MAINTAINING FAST SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co. Ltd. 1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD. 1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELZEN, Theo, L. Bovenstraat 6 NL-6223 AD Maastricht / NL | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 93906873.0 | 01.04.1993 | [1994/12] | WO1993JP00421 | Priority number, date | NL19920000606 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: NL 9200606 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320550 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587913 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587913 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/3625 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/12] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE MIT EINEM ADRESSIERUNGSSCHEMA ZUM ERREICHEN VON HOHEM KONTRAST UND HOHER HELLIGKEIT MIT INSTANDHALTUNG VON SCHNELLEM SCHALTEN | [1994/12] | English: | LIQUID-CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE WITH ADDRESSING SCHEME TO ACHIEVE HIGH CONTRAST AND HIGH BRIGHTNESS VALUES WHILE MAINTAINING FAST SWITCHING | [1994/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES AVEC SYSTEME D'ADRESSAGE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES VALEURS ELEVEES DE CONTRASTE ET DE LUMINOSITE TOUT EN CONSERVANT UNE GRANDE VITESSE DE COMMUTATION | [1994/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 15.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2752602 | [X] - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS 'Conference record of the 1988 international display research conference' 1988 , IEEE , NY |