EP0628005 - AN EASY OPENING FLEXIBLE PLASTIC BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/50] | AN EASY OPENING FLEXIBLE PLASTIC BAG AND A METHOD OF MAKING SAME | ||
[1999/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paramount Packaging Corporation 202 Oak Avenue, P.O. Box 902 Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states PARAMOUNT PACKAGING CORPORATION 202 Oak Avenue, P.O. Box 902 Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRAD, Daniel, J. 1622 Wexford Drive Murfreesboro, TN 37129 / US | 02 /
ROLAND, Mark, A. 1803 Atlas Road Murfreesboro, TN 37130 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93906983.7 | 25.02.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993US01518 | Priority number, date | US19920842637 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: US 842637 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316929 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628005 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628005 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
B65D33/10 (EP,US);
B65D75/58 (EP,US);
B65D75/5833 (EP,US);
B31B70/864 (EP,US);
B65D85/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/50] | B65D30/18, B65D30/20, B65D33/10, B65D65/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | LEICHT ZU ÖFFNENDER, FLEXIBLER PLASTIKBEUTEL | [1999/35] | English: | AN EASY OPENING FLEXIBLE PLASTIC BAG | [1999/35] | French: | SAC EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE SOUPLE A OUVERTURE FACILE | [1999/35] |
Former [1994/50] | LEICHT ZO ÖFFNENDER, FLEXIBLER PLASTIKBEUTEL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1994/50] | AN EASY OPENING FLEXIBLE PLASTIC BAG AND A METHOD OF MAKING SAME | ||
Former [1994/50] | SAC EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE SOUPLE A OUVERTURE FACILE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 23.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2000 | CH | 28.06.2000 | ES | 28.06.2000 | GR | 28.06.2000 | IT | 28.06.2000 | LI | 28.06.2000 | DK | 28.09.2000 | PT | 28.09.2000 | SE | 28.09.2000 | LU | 25.02.2001 | MC | 28.02.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
GR | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
LU | 25.02.2001 | ||
MC | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
GR | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
LU | 25.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
GR | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
CH | 28.06.2000 | ||
LI | 28.06.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 28.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4573203 (PEPPIATT HARRY R [US]); | [Y]DE9105943U ; | [XY]DE9109154U ; | [Y]US5080497 (PEPPIATT HARRY R [US]) | Examination | US4934535 | DE9109154U |