EP0675961 - Treatment of tumorigenic disease with a modified HSV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/41] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR GENE, TUMOR, AND VIRAL INFECTION THERAPY, AND PREVENTION OF PROGRAMMED CELL DEATH (APOPTOSIS) | ||
[2002/03] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, BE, DK, ES, IT, NL, SE | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arch Development Corporation 1101 East 58th Street, The University of Chicago Chicago Illinois 60637 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states ARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 1101 East 58th Street, The University of Chicago Chicago, Illinois 60637 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROIZMAN, Bernard 5555 S. Everett Chicago, IL 60637 / US | 02 /
CHOU, Joany 5227 S. Kimbark Chicago, IL 60615 / US | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 860 880 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/41] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93907093.4 | 26.02.1993 | [1995/41] | WO1993US01801 | Priority number, date | US19920861233 | 31.03.1992 Original published format: US 861233 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319591 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675961 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675961 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/869, C12N15/38, A61K39/245 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
A61K38/162 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/245 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5058 (EP,US);
G01N33/5073 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16622 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16634 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | C12N15/86, C12N15/38, C07K13/00, A61K37/02, A61K39/245, G01N33/50, A61K48/00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/03] | C12N15/869, C12N15/38, C07K14/035, A61K39/245, G01N33/50, A61K48/00 | ||
Former IPC [1995/41] | C12N15/86, C12N15/38, C07K13/00, A61K37/02, A61K39/245, G01N33/50, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/41] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Tumorerkrankungen mit modifiziertem HSV | [2002/03] | English: | Treatment of tumorigenic disease with a modified HSV | [2002/03] | French: | Traitement de maladies tumorigéniques à l'aide d'un HSV modifié | [2002/03] |
Former [1995/41] | METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE GEN-, TUMOR- UND VIRALE INFEKTIONSTHERAPY UND VERHINDERUNG DES PROGRAMMIERTEN ZELLTOD | ||
Former [1995/41] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR GENE, TUMOR, AND VIRAL INFECTION THERAPY, AND PREVENTION OF PROGRAMMED CELL DEATH (APOPTOSIS) | ||
Former [1995/41] | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISES EN THERAPIE GENIQUE ET POUR LA THERAPIE CONTRE LES TUMEURS ET LES INFECTIONS VIRALES, ET POUR LA PREVENTION DE LA MORT CELLULAIRE PROGRAMMEE (APOPTOSE) | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 07.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 29.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2006 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.08.2003
30.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE BIOVEX LIMITED 70 Milton Park Abingdon Oxford OX14 4RX / GB Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.08.2003
30.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE BIOVEX LIMITED 70 Milton Park Abingdon Oxford OX14 4RX / GB Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.08.2003
BioVex Limited 70 Milton Park Abingdon Oxford OX14 4RX / GB Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO., Gray's Inn, 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 06.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.04.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2008 | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.05.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/37] | Appeal following opposition | 15.01.2009 | Appeal received No. T0310/09 | 09.03.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.07.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 18.05.2005 | Appeal received No. T0665/05 | 01.08.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 27.05.2005 | Appeal received No. T0665/05 | 28.07.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 10.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.11.2002 | GR | 27.11.2002 | LI | 27.11.2002 | IE | 26.02.2003 | LU | 26.02.2003 | PT | 27.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | AT | 26.02.2011 | IT | 26.02.2011 | ES | 27.02.2011 | SE | 27.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | DK | 28.02.2011 | NL | 01.09.2011 | [2013/21] |
Former [2005/02] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 26.02.2003 | ||
LU | 26.02.2003 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 26.02.2003 | ||
LU | 26.02.2003 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 26.02.2003 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | CH | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
LI | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 27.11.2002 | |
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 27.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0243155 (MERIEUX INST [FR]) [A] 1-4,7-9 * page 4, line 7 - line 23 * * page 7, line 3 - line 12 * * page 13, line 23 - line 32 * * page 14, line 1 - line 11 * * page 23 *; | [A]EP0453242 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9204050 (ROIZMAN BERNARD [US]) [A] 1-9,14-21,23-25,31-33 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHOU ET AL., "Mapping of Herpes Simplex virus-1 Neurovirulence to gamma134.5, a gene nonessential for growth in culture", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 250, no. 4985, pages 1262 - 1266, XP000255907 [X] 1,2,7,9,14-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2173860 | [AD] - CHOU ET AL., "The Herpes Simplex Virus 1 gene for ICP34.5, which maps in inverted repeats, is conserved in several limited-passage isolates but not in strain 17syn+", J. VIROLOGY, (199003), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 1014 - 1020, XP008049066 [AD] 1-9,14-21 * page 1018 * | International search | [Y] - HENDERSON S,ET AL, "Induction of bcl-2 expression by Epstein-Barr virus latent membrane protein 1 protects infected B cells from programmed cell death.", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, US, (19910628), vol. 65, no. 7, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(91)90007-L, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 1107 - 1115, XP002224486 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(91)90007-L | [Y] - STRASSER A., HARRIS A. W., CORY S., "BCL- TRANSGENE INHIBITS T CELL DEATH AND PERTURBS THYMIC SELF-CENSORSHIP.", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, US, (19911129), vol. 67., no. 06., doi:10.1016/0092-8674(91)90362-3, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 889 - 899., XP002014059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(91)90362-3 | [Y] - SENTMAN C.L. ET AL, "bcl-2 Inhibits Multiple Forms of Apoptosis but Not Negative Selection in Thymocytes", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, US, (19911129), vol. 67, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(91)90361-2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 879 - 888, XP002987880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(91)90361-2 | [Y] - GREGORY C. D., ET AL., "ACTIVATION OF EPSTEIN-BARR VIRUS LATENT GENES PROTECTS HUMAN B CELLS FROM DEATH BY APOPTOSIS.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19910214), vol. 349., doi:10.1038/349612a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 612 - 614., XP002038738 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/349612a0 | by applicant | US4769331 | - HENDERSON ET AL., CELL, vol. 65, pages 1107 - 1991 | - LORD ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 2823 | - DELUCA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 56, pages 558 - 570 | - POST; ROIZMAN, CELL, (1991), vol. 25, page 227 | - SNYDER ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 33 - 51 | - RANFRANZ ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 713 - 729 | - RYDER ET AL., J. NEUROBIOL., (1990), vol. 21, pages 356 - 375 | - ACKERMAN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1986), vol. 58, pages 843 - 850 |