EP0630311 - SPLIT ABRASVIE ROLL ATTACHMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Masashi 8-8, Minami Hashimoto 3-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken 229 / JP | 02 /
NAGAFUCHI, Naohiro 8-8, Minami Hashimoto 3-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken 229 / JP | 03 /
FUKASE, Yoshihiro 5500, Oaza Osanagi Higashine-shi Yamagata-ken 999-34 / JP | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93907241.9 | 05.03.1993 | [1994/52] | WO1993US01999 | Priority number, date | JP19920050573 | 09.03.1992 Original published format: JP 5057392 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317833 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630311 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630311 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B24D9/04 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
B24D9/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/52] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM EINER TEILBAREN SCHLEIFWALZE | [1994/52] | English: | SPLIT ABRASVIE ROLL ATTACHMENT SYSTEM | [1994/52] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION POUR ROULEAU ABRASIF FENDU | [1994/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE394137 (SCHMID & WEZEL); | [Y]DE667766 (HEINRICH REINHARDT C); | [A]US2145980 (HADWIGER OSCAR E, et al); | [A]EP0395393 (TASIKAS JAMES [CA]) |