EP0629164 - THRUST VECTORING FREE WING AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHMITTLE, Hugh J. 605 Carolyn Road Glen Burnie, MD 21061 / US | [1994/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93907455.5 | 12.03.1993 | [1994/51] | WO1993US02267 | Priority number, date | US19920850913 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: US 850913 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317908 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629164 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629164 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/38 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
B64U50/13 (EP,US);
B64C29/0033 (EP,US);
B64C29/02 (EP,US);
B64C3/385 (EP,US);
B64C39/04 (EP,US);
B64U30/12 (EP,US);
B64U50/11 (EP,US);
B64U50/15 (EP,US);
B64U70/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/51] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUG MIT FREIEN FLÜGELN UND SCHUBUMLENKUNG | [1994/51] | English: | THRUST VECTORING FREE WING AIRCRAFT | [1994/51] | French: | AERONEF A AILES LIBRES A POUSSEE VECTORISEE | [1994/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 07.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.1999 | BE | 26.05.1999 | CH | 26.05.1999 | ES | 26.05.1999 | FR | 26.05.1999 | GR | 26.05.1999 | IT | 26.05.1999 | LI | 26.05.1999 | NL | 26.05.1999 | SE | 26.05.1999 | DK | 26.08.1999 | PT | 26.08.1999 | DE | 27.08.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
ES | 26.05.1999 | ||
FR | 26.05.1999 | ||
GR | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
NL | 26.05.1999 | ||
SE | 26.05.1999 | ||
DK | 26.08.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
ES | 26.05.1999 | ||
GR | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
NL | 26.05.1999 | ||
SE | 26.05.1999 | ||
DK | 26.08.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
ES | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
NL | 26.05.1999 | ||
SE | 26.05.1999 | ||
DK | 26.08.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
ES | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
NL | 26.05.1999 | ||
SE | 26.05.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
ES | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
SE | 26.05.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
SE | 26.05.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
CH | 26.05.1999 | ||
LI | 26.05.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
PT | 26.08.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
FR | 22.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 26.05.1999 | |
BE | 26.05.1999 | ||
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 26.05.1999 | |
DE | 27.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | DE | 27.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1844448 (WILLIAM SRAMEK); | [X]US5086993 (WAINFAN BARNABY [US]) | International search | [A]GB191407209 (DESSOLIERS HIPPOLYTE [DZ]); | [A]US1845307 (MAXWELL JOHN S); | [X]US2058678 (KEITH FRY VERN); | [A]US2063030 (GOODMAN CROUCH RUPERT J); | [X]US2590312 (HARTLEY EMMETT C); | [X]US2708081 (DOBSON FRANKLIN A); | [X]GB732657 (FRANCIS JAMES ECKINGTON); | [A]US3477664 (JONES EDWARD B); | [X]US4730795 (DAVID CONSTANT V [US]); | [X]US4928907 (ZUCK DANIEL R [US]); | [XP]US5098034 (LENDRIET WILLIAM C [US]) |