EP0631602 - HIGH IMPACT POLYESTER/ETHYLENE COPOLYMER BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Max, Frederick, Jr. 509 Altamont Drive Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
STEWART, Mark, Edward 417 Elmhurst Drive Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 03 /
TANT, Martin, Ray 628 Montezuma Road Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93907591.7 | 11.03.1993 | [1995/01] | WO1993US02522 | Priority number, date | US19920851592 | 16.03.1992 Original published format: US 851592 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319127 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631602 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631602 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, // (C08L67/02, 23:08) | [1995/01] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/01] | Title | German: | HOCHSCHLAGZÄHE POLYESTER-ETHYLENCOPOLYMER MISCHUNGEN | [1995/01] | English: | HIGH IMPACT POLYESTER/ETHYLENE COPOLYMER BLENDS | [1995/01] | French: | MELANGES DE COPOLYMERES DE POLYESTER ET D'ETHYLENE PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE ELEVEE A LA FLEXION PAR CHOC | [1995/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 25.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 30.09.1997 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | MC | 01.10.1997 | |
Former [1998/11] | MC | 30.09.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1576703 ; | [X]US3580965 (BRINKMANN LUDWIG, et al); | [X]EP0141016 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) |