EP0636002 - A SALT PRODUCT AND A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitaveita Sudurnesja Brekkustig 36 I-260 Njardvik / IS | [1995/12] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states SAGA FOOD INGREDIENTS A/S Vilhelmskildevej 1D DK-5700 Svendborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDERIKSEN, Wilmar Friis Olesvej 13 DK-2950 Vedbaek / DK | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [1996/28] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard, et al c/o Chas. Hude, 33, H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [1995/05] | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard DK-1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 93907821.8 | 18.03.1993 | [1995/05] | WO1993DK00100 | Priority number, date | DK19920000362 | 19.03.1992 Original published format: DK 36292 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318668 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636002 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636002 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/237 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
A23L27/40 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | SALZPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1995/05] | English: | A SALT PRODUCT AND A METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [1995/05] | French: | PRODUIT SALIN ET PROCEDE POUR SA PREPARATION | [1995/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.1997
02.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.1997
02.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1997/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.1997
Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | 07.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.01.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/12] | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 26.05.1999 | Appeal received No. T0582/99 | 24.06.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.05.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 22.05.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.1996 | BE | 21.08.1996 | CH | 21.08.1996 | ES | 21.08.1996 | GR | 21.08.1996 | IT | 21.08.1996 | LI | 21.08.1996 | PT | 21.11.1996 | IE | 18.03.1997 | DE | 01.10.2004 | [2005/14] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
ES | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
IE | 18.03.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
IE | 18.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
BE | 21.08.1996 | ||
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
PT | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 21.08.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]DK150601B (SUNPOL CONSULT APS [DK]); | [X]WO9000522 (HANSON & MOEHRING AB [SE]) |