EP0635138 - OPTICAL COMPONENT COMPRISING PRISMS AND A GRATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS Vuorimiehentie 5 02150 Espoo 15 / FI | [1997/51] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS Vuorimiehentie 5 SF-02150 Espoo 15 / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIKIO, Mauri Ohjastie 1 C 3 SF-90540 Oulu / FI | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Helino, Timo Kalervo, et al Papula Oy ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Helino, Timo Kalervo, et al Papula Rein Lahtela Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1995/04] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93907891.1 | 07.04.1993 | [1995/04] | WO1993FI00150 | Priority number, date | FI19920001564 | 08.04.1992 Original published format: FI 921564 | [1995/04] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321548 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635138 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635138 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/00, G02B5/04, G02B5/18, G01J3/18 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
G01J3/18 (EP);
G02B5/04 (EP);
G02B5/1814 (EP);
G02B6/29307 (EP);
G02B6/29373 (EP);
G02B6/4206 (EP);
G01J2003/1208 (EP);
G01J2003/145 (EP);
G01J3/1838 (EP);
G01J3/2803 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES ELEMENT MIT PRISMEN UND EINEM BEUGUNGSGITTER | [1997/51] | English: | OPTICAL COMPONENT COMPRISING PRISMS AND A GRATING | [1995/04] | French: | COMPOSANT OPTIQUE COMPRENANT DES PRISMES ET UN RESEAU DE DIFFRACTION | [1995/04] |
Former [1995/04] | PRISMEN UND EIN BEUGUNGSGITTER ENTHULLENDES OPTISCHES ELEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1993 | Translation filed | 27.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 13.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4475792 ; | [A]US5002390 | Examination | WO9007723 | US4747655 | US3922089 |