EP0634000 - BLOOD SAMPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED Brook Hill Woodstock, Oxfordshire OX20 1TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED Brook Hill Woodstock, Oxford OX20 1TU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSHALL, Jeremy 16 Cranham Street Jericho, Oxford OX2 6DD / GB | 02 /
CROSSMAN, David Danvers The Tower Christmas Common, Oxford OX9 5HL / GB | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93907943.0 | 30.03.1993 | [1995/03] | WO1993GB00650 | Priority number, date | GB19920007120 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: GB 9207120 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319671 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634000 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634000 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/15117 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/150549 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/034 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2560/04 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | G01B1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | BLUTABNAHME VORRICHTUNG | [1995/03] | English: | BLOOD SAMPLING DEVICE | [1995/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT D'ECHANTILLONS DE SANG | [1995/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.08.1996 | [2003/08] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR771890 ; | [A]US4539988 (SHIRLEY GAYLORD R [US], et al); | [A]EP0255338 (GLYME VALLEY TECHN LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0427406 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP0433050 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP0458451 (RYDER INT CORP [US], et al) |