EP0643648 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A DRIVELINE INCLUDING A CONTINUOUSLY- VARIABLE-RATIO TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO CONTROL SYSTEMS FOR DRIVELINES INCLUDING CONTINUOUSLY-VARIABLE-RATIO TRANSMISSIONS | ||
[1997/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOROTRAK (DEVELOPMENT) LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [1995/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENWOOD, Christopher John 113 Fossdale Moss, Leyland Preston, Lancashire PR5 3WS / GB | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Trevor-Briscoe, David William Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Trevor-Briscoe, David William Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1995/12] | Stables, Patrick Antony Torotrak (Development) Limited 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93908030.5 | 13.04.1993 | [1995/12] | WO1993GB00763 | Priority number, date | GB19920008363 | 16.04.1992 Original published format: GB 9208363 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321031 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643648 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643648 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/14 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/101 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F16H61/66 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ANTRIEBSSTRANG MIT STUFENLOSEM GETRIEBE | [1997/10] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A DRIVELINE INCLUDING A CONTINUOUSLY- VARIABLE-RATIO TRANSMISSION | [1997/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION Y COMPRIS UNE TRANSMISSION A RAPPORT VARIABLE EN CONTINU | [1997/10] |
Former [1995/12] | VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH STEUERUNGSSYSTEME FÜR ANTRIEBSSTRÄNG MIT STUFENLOSEN GETRIEBEN | ||
Former [1995/12] | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO CONTROL SYSTEMS FOR DRIVELINES INCLUDING CONTINUOUSLY-VARIABLE-RATIO TRANSMISSIONS | ||
Former [1995/12] | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTES AUX SYSTEMES DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSIONS Y COMPRIS LES TRANSMISSIONS A RAPPORT VARIABLE EN CONTINU | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5047937 (VAHABZADEH HAMID [US], et al); | [X]EP0095173 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]); | [Y]DE2720950 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]EP0352110 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |