EP0586681 - A METHOD OF BIDIRECTIONAL COMMUNICATION IN A CELLULAR MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WHEREIN DIFFERENT BASE STATIONS ARE USED FOR THE DOWNLINK AND UPLINK CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Bengt, Yngve Box 42 S-142 51 Djursholm / SE | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/29] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department KI/ERA/JT/P 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93908208.7 | 05.03.1993 | [1994/11] | WO1993SE00192 | Priority number, date | SE19920000915 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: SE 9200915 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319537 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586681 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586681 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/20 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H04W36/302 (EP,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/11] | H04B7/26, H04Q7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/38] |
Former [1994/11] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BIDIREKTIONALEN KOMMUNIKATION IN EINER ZELLULAREN MOBILFUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSANORDNUNG, IN DER VERSCHIEDENE BASISSTATIONEN ZUR AB- UND AUFWÄRTSVERBINDUNG BENUTZT WERDEN | [1998/49] | English: | A METHOD OF BIDIRECTIONAL COMMUNICATION IN A CELLULAR MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WHEREIN DIFFERENT BASE STATIONS ARE USED FOR THE DOWNLINK AND UPLINK CONNECTION | [1994/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION BIDIRECTIONNELLE DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRE MOBILE DANS LEQUEL DIFFERENTES STATIONS DE BASE ASSURENT LA LIAISON DESCENDANTE ET MONTANTE | [1994/11] |
Former [1994/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR BIDIREKTIONALEN KOMMUNIKATION IN EINER ZELLULAREN MOBILFUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSANORDNUNG, IN DER VERSCHIEDENE BASISSTATIONEN ZUR AB- UND AUFWÄRTSVERBINDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8808650 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |