EP0632763 - PRINTING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AQUA DYNAMICS GROUP CORP 330 South Maple Street Adamsville, TN 38310 / US | [1995/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRISON, Alexander, J. Route 2, Box 598 Selmer, TN 38375 / US | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93908569.2 | 25.03.1993 | [1995/02] | WO1993US02788 | Priority number, date | US19920860002 | 27.03.1992 Original published format: US 860002 | [1995/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9319939 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632763 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/00, B41F7/26 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
B41F7/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/02] | B41F7/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DRUCKEN | [1995/02] | English: | PRINTING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1995/02] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE D'IMPRESSION | [1995/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 22.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 07.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]DD238945 ; | [Y]US4888113 ; | [Y]US4527479 ; | [A]US4548645 ; | [A]US4865748 | [A] - Graphic Arts Monthly, (SCARLETT) December 1983, "Water Treatment Processes", 159-160. |