EP0587864 - PIXEL ARRAY SCANNING SYSTEM WITH IMAGE SIGNAL ISOLATED FROM PIXEL ADDRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago, IL 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 55 Shuman Boulevard, Suite 600 Naperville, IL 60563-8487 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICAN, Stephen, George 4629 Dover Street Chicago, IL 60640 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [1994/40] | Low, Peter John, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester, M2 7BD / GB | ||
Former [1994/12] | Low, Peter John Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester, M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93908709.4 | 31.03.1993 | [1994/12] | WO1993US03062 | Priority number, date | US19920861929 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: US 861929 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320649 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587864 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/14, H04N3/12, H04N3/15 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
H04N3/12 (EP,US);
H04N3/14 (US);
H04N25/76 (EP);
H04N3/1506 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/12] | Title | German: | ABTASTVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PIXELANORDNUNG MIT EINEM VON DER PIXELADRESSIERUNG GETRENNTEN BILDSIGNAL | [1994/12] | English: | PIXEL ARRAY SCANNING SYSTEM WITH IMAGE SIGNAL ISOLATED FROM PIXEL ADDRESSING | [1994/12] | French: | BALAYAGE DE RANGEES DE PIXELS A SIGNAL D'IMAGE ISOLE DE L'ADRESSAGE DES PIXELS | [1994/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 28.09.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3590154 (MORICCA ANTHONY C); | [X]US3848086 (FUJIO T, et al); | [X]WO8102084 (EASTMAN TECHNOLOGY [US]) |