EP0635053 - Rhamnogalacturonan acetylesterase (RGAE) from Aspergillus aculeatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/04] | A NOVEL ENZYME AND A DNA SEQUENCE | ||
[2002/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogsho̸jvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖRREICH, Kurt Vogesenstrasse 18 D-7889 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 02 /
CHRISTENSEN, Flemming, Mark Gl. Vallerödvej 23 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | 03 /
SCHNELL, Yvette Oberdorfstrasse 10 CH-4244 Roschenz / CH | 04 /
MISCHLER, Marcel Waldeck 95 CH-4204 Himmelried / CH | 05 /
DALBÖGE, Henrik Parkvej 28 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 06 /
HELDT-HANSEN, Hans, Peter Vangeledet 53 DK-2830 Virum / DK | [1995/04] | Application number, filing date | 93908830.8 | 29.03.1993 | [1995/04] | WO1993DK00109 | Priority number, date | DK19920000420 | 27.03.1992 Original published format: DK 42092 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320190 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635053 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635053 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/18, C12N15/55 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/18 (EP,US);
C12N9/2402 (EP,US);
C12Y301/01086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Rhamnogalacturonan acetylesterase (RGAE) von Aspergillus aculeatus | [2002/25] | English: | Rhamnogalacturonan acetylesterase (RGAE) from Aspergillus aculeatus | [2002/25] | French: | Rhamnogalacturonan acetylesterase (RGAE) d'Aspergillus aculeatus | [2002/25] |
Former [1995/04] | EIN NEUARTIGES ENZYM UND SEINE DNA SEQUENZ | ||
Former [1995/04] | A NOVEL ENZYME AND A DNA SEQUENCE | ||
Former [1995/04] | NOUVELLE ENZYME ET SEQUENCE D'ADN | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 27.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | IT | 04.06.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 04.09.2003 | |
PT | 04.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0080827 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0339011 (UNIV GENT [BE]); | [A]EP0388593 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) | [A] - Dialog Information Services, File 55, Biosis, Dialog Accession No. 7706525, BIOSIS Number: 90074525, WILLIAMSON G. et al.: "Gelation of Sugar-Beet and Citrus Pectins Using Enzymes Extracted from Orange Peel", Carbohydr Polym 13 (4), 1990, 387-398. | [A] - Carbohydrate Research, Volume 206, 1990, pages 105 - 115, HENK A. SCHOLS et al., "Rhamnogalacturonase: a Novel Enzyme that Degrades the Hairy Regions of Pectins". |