EP0643682 - PROCESSES AND INTERMEDIATES FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2-SUBSTITUTED BENZALDEHYDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | ||
For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMBATZ, Kerry, Joseph 606 Westbourne Road West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 02 /
FORTH, Michael Anthony, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. Old Powder Mills, Near Leigh Tonbridge, Kent TN11 9AN / GB | 03 /
HAYES, Jerome Francis, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. Old Powder Mills, Near Leigh Tonbridge, KentTN 11 t9AN / GB | 04 /
MITCHELL, Michael Barry, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. Old Powder Mills, Near Leigh Tonbridge, Kent TN11 9AN / GB | 05 /
SMITH, Stephen Alexander, SmithKline Beecham Pharm Old Powder Mills, Near Leigh Tonbridge, Kent TN11 9AN / GB | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Connell, Anthony Christopher GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Connell, Anthony Christopher SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93909170.8 | 25.03.1993 | [1995/12] | WO1993US02803 | Priority number, date | US19920858384 | 25.03.1992 Original published format: US 858384 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319033 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643682 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/00, C07C45/42, C07C249/02, C07C251/16, C07D307/52, C07D307/58, C07D307/64, C07D333/32, C07D333/34 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C07C251/86 (EP);
C07C45/00 (KR);
C07C251/24 (EP);
C07C45/516 (EP);
C07C47/546 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/516, C07C47/546 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-SUBSTITUIERTEN BENZALDEHYDEN | [1995/12] | English: | PROCESSES AND INTERMEDIATES FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2-SUBSTITUTED BENZALDEHYDES | [1995/12] | French: | PROCEDES ET INTERMEDIAIRES POUR LA PREPARATION DE BENZALDEHYDES 2-SUBSTITUTES | [1995/12] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.02.1994 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US3466164 (GAETANO JOSEPH F DE, et al); | [Y]US3637851 (RUMANOWSKI EDMUND J); | [Y]US3910944 (GALL MARTIN); | [X]US4198349 (DOUGLAS GEORGE H [US], et al); | [Y]US4231962 (REINEHR DIETER, et al); | [XY]EP0217269 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]US4820719 (GLEASON JOHN G [US], et al) | [Y] - J. Org. Chem., 1984, Vol. 49, WATENABLE et al., "Ortho-Lithiated Tertiary Benzamides, etc.", pp-742-749, see esp. schemes I-III on page 743 and definition for 2. | [Y] - J. Org. Chem., 1965, Vol. 41, No. 9, ZIEGLER et al., "Substitution Reactions of Specifically Ortho-Metalated Piperonyl Cyclohexylimine", pp. 1564-6, see esp. last paragraph, left col., pg. 1564. | [Y] - J. Org. Chem., 1975, Vol. 40, No. 13, GECHWEND et al., "Ortho-Lithiation of Aryloxazolines", pp. 2008-9, see esp. figures 1-3 on page 2008. | [Y] - Tetrahedron Letters, 1978, No. 51, DE SILVA et al., "Directed Lithiation of N, N-Diethylbenzamides, etc.", pp. 5107-10, see esp. pg. 5108, lines 1 and 2 of the text. | [Y] - Advanced Organic Chemistry, 1977, second edition, March, J., pp. 805-7, see esp. page 806, top. | [X] - J. Org. Chem., 1978, Vol. 43, No. 21, MURAHASHI et al., "Reactions of Cyclometallated Palladium Complexes with Organolithium Compounds or Grignand Reagents", pp. 4099-106, see esp. compounds 5 and 7 on page 4099, 7 on pages 4100, and 28 and 29 on pages 4102. |