EP0610449 - SLIDER AIR BEARING SURFACE WITH ANGLED RAIL CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1995/44] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | |||
Former [1994/33] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, Earl, Albert 2429 13th Avenue N.W. Rochester, MN 55901 / US | 02 /
HARWOOD, Richard, Fred 2021 18th Street N.W. Rochester, MN 55901 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang, et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93909332.4 | 16.09.1992 | [1994/33] | WO1992EP02119 | Priority number, date | US19910783477 | 28.10.1991 Original published format: US 783477 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309533 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610449 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610449 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/60, G11B17/32, G11B21/21 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
G11B5/6005 (EP,US);
G11B21/21 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/33] | Title | German: | LUFTKISSENGLEITLAGER-OBERFLÄCHE MIT WINKELEISENKONFIGURATION | [1994/33] | English: | SLIDER AIR BEARING SURFACE WITH ANGLED RAIL CONFIGURATION | [1994/33] | French: | SURFACE DE SUPPORT A COUSSIN D'AIR POUR COULISSE A CONFIGURATION DE RAILS ANGULAIRES | [1994/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.06.1997 | IT | 25.06.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 25.06.1997 | |
FR | 21.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | FR | 21.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0387444 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]); | [X]EP0432733 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [X] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol 11, No 147, P575, abstract of JP 61-283083, publ 1986-12-13 | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, Vol. 22, No. 5, September 1986 James W. White: "A UNIFORM FLYING HEIGHT ROTARY ACTUATED AIR BEARING SLIDER ", | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol 9, No 170, P373, abstract of JP 60- 47278, publ 1985-03-14 |