EP0639054 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING HIGH-QUALITY PROTEIN PRODUCTS FROM WHEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 CH-1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, John Algade 9, Grundfor DK-8382 Hinnerup / DK | 02 /
LARSEN, Peter, Henrik Junivej 38A DK-8210 Aarhus V / DK | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93909558.4 | 29.04.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993SE00378 | Priority number, date | SE19920001435 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: SE 9201435 | [1995/08] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321781 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639054 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639054 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/20 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
A23J3/08 (EP,US);
A23C9/1425 (EP,US);
A23J1/205 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/833 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54242, A23V2250/54244, A23V2300/08, A23V2300/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHQUALITATIVEN MOLKENEIWEISSPRODUKTES | [1995/08] | English: | METHOD FOR OBTAINING HIGH-QUALITY PROTEIN PRODUCTS FROM WHEY | [1995/08] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES PRODUITS A BASE DE PROTEINES DE HAUTE QUALITE A PARTIR DU LACTOSERUM | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1993 | Translation filed | 27.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 27.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 06.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE APV Pasilac A/S 2 Europaplads 8100 Aarhus C / DK Opponent's representative Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik Chas. Hude 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE APV Pasilac A/S 2 Europaplads 8100 Aarhus C / DK Opponent's representative Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | 14.07.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.01.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.03.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/26] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 09.06.2000 | Appeal received No. T0679/00 | 10.08.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.03.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 10.09.1997 | SE | 10.12.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | SE | 10.12.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0022696 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | [A]EP0311283 (EXPRESS FOODS GROUP LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0320152 (EXPRESS FOODS GROUP LTD [GB]); | [A]WO8911226 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | [A]EP0374390 (BOUNOUS GUSTAVO PROF [CA], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 97, No. 21, 22 November 1982 (22.11.82), (Columbus, Ohio, USA), AMUNDSON, C.H. et al., "Production of Enriched Protein Fractions of Beta-Lactoglobulin and Alpha-Lactalbumin from Cheese Whey", page 654, the Abstract No. 180496a, J. Food Process. Preserv. 1982, 6(2), 55-71, (Eng). |