EP0642705 - INDUCTIVE COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KS TECHNIQUES Rue Bois d'Evegnée 55 4630 Soumagne / BE | [1997/03] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states NOBREAK POWER S.A. Parc Industriel, Rue de l'Avenir 8 B-4460 Grace-Hollogne / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUPISIEWICZ, Stefan 142, rue Bois d'Evegnée B-4634 Soumagne / BE | 02 /
SCHOEBRECHTS, Jacques 61, Chaussée de Wégimont B-4634 Soumagne / BE | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 93909702.8 | 26.05.1993 | [1995/11] | WO1993BE00027 | Priority number, date | BE19920000487 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: BE 9200487 | [1995/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324986 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642705 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642705 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02K49/06, H02K49/02 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
H02K49/02 (EP);
H02K49/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | INDUKTIVER KUPPLER | [1995/11] | English: | INDUCTIVE COUPLER | [1995/11] | French: | COUPLEUR INDUCTIF | [1995/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.1996 | [1997/16] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1702755 (WEYDELL JARL M); | [Y]GB564665 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [X]FR1001234 ; | [Y]FR1029219 (ASEA AB) | [X] - GB,A,J16095 (HILL) 7 Avril 1910 |