EP0641171 - CUTTING AND EMBROIDERY PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CADCAM TECHNOLOGY LIMITED 43 Arkwright Street Nottingham NG2 2JR / GB | [1996/12] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states CADCAM PUNCH LIMITED 43 Arkwright Street Nottingham NG2 2JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORTON, Norman Cherry Lodge, The Maltings Cropwell Bishop, Nottinghamsh. NG12 3DA / GB | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910202.6 | 14.05.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993GB00994 | Priority number, date | GB19920010521 | 16.05.1992 Original published format: GB 9210521 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322944 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641171 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641171 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A41H43/00, D05C5/04, D05B21/00 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
D05C5/04 (EP,US);
B26F1/00 (EP,US);
B26F1/3806 (EP,US);
B26D5/00 (EP,US);
B26F2210/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1995/10] | Title | German: | SCHNEID- UND STICKVERFAHREN | [1995/10] | English: | CUTTING AND EMBROIDERY PROCESS | [1995/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECOUPAGE ET DE BRODERIE | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 08.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.1996 | DK | 28.08.1996 | GR | 28.08.1996 | PT | 28.11.1996 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
DK | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 28.08.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4561127 (GERBER HEINZ J [US]); | [A]WO8606423 (WILCOM PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]FR2659264 (FLANDRES MANUFACTURE BRODERIES [FR]) |