EP0608429 - COLOR INK JET RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Yaeko Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 02 /
ITANO, Masaaki Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Hiroko Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392 / JP | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910378.4 | 24.05.1993 | [1994/31] | WO1993JP00680 | Priority number, date | JP19920130269 | 22.05.1992 Original published format: JP 13026992 | JP19920152385 | 11.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15238592 | JP19920242221 | 10.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24222192 | JP19920348848 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34884892 | [1994/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324330 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608429 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608429 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21, B41M5/00, C09D11/00 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/2107 (EP,US);
B41M1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/31] | Title | German: | MEHRFARBIGES TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [1996/41] | English: | COLOR INK JET RECORDING METHOD | [1994/31] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION EN COULEUR PAR JET D'ENCRE | [1994/31] |
Former [1994/31] | MEHRFARBIGES TINTENSTRAHLAUSZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1994 | Translation filed | 01.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1994 | Search fee paid | 01.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS60174651 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPS60253550 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH0341171 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH03255173 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPS62223280 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01204980 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPS63139964 (CANON KK) |