EP0638151 - Power transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/07] | FLAT-FACED BELT, PULLEY, COMBINATION AND METHOD | ||
[1997/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAYCO PRODUCTS, INC. One Prestige Place Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US | [1995/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Jack, D., Jr. 673 West Primrose Springfield, MO 65084 / US | 02 /
RICHMOND, Kenneth, D. Rte 1, Box 230 Nixa, MO 65714 / US | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93910616.7 | 09.04.1993 | [1995/07] | WO1993US03573 | Priority number, date | US19920875857 | 29.04.1992 Original published format: US 875857 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322583 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638151 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638151 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/00 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
F16G1/28 (EP,US);
F16G5/20 (EP,US);
F16H7/02 (EP,US);
F02B2275/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | Kraftübertragungsvorrichtung | [1997/27] | English: | Power transmission device | [1997/27] | French: | Transmission d'énergie | [1997/27] |
Former [1995/07] | FLACHRIEMEN, RIEMENSCHEIBE, KOMBINATION UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [1995/07] | FLAT-FACED BELT, PULLEY, COMBINATION AND METHOD | ||
Former [1995/07] | COURROIE A FACE PLATE, POULIE, ENSEMBLE ET PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0349434 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 13 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2600589 (SARDOU MAX [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 5 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0425818 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 30 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0049131 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 15; figure 2 *; | [AD]US4127039 (HOLLAWAY JR GERALD C) [AD] 2,4,5,7 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 *; | [AD]US3822516 (HUBER W) [AD] 3 * column 3, line 33 - line 39; figure 2 *; | [AD]US3951006 (FISHER DAVID G, et al); | [AD]US4822324 (GEORGET PIERRE [FR]); | [AD]US4596538 (HENDERSON DEWEY D [US]); | [AD]US4329192 (WHITE JR JACK D, et al); | [AD]US4938736 (MIRANTI JR JOSEPH P [US]) | International search | [XY]US4031761 (FISHER DAVID G, et al); | [Y]US4657526 (TANGORRA GIORGIO [IT], et al); | [Y]US4254589 (HUNT IV WALTER H, et al); | [Y]US4106966 (BROOKS ALDEN W); | [Y]US3839116 (THOMAS J, et al); | [Y]US3626774 (SCHON WERNER C) |