EP0639310 - SELECTIVE CALL RECEIVER WITH A UNIVERSAL SYNCHRONIZATION CODE OPERATING MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1995/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUN, Kyung, T. 901 S. Country Club Drive, 2102 Mesa, AZ 85210 / US | 02 /
GANUCHEAU, Charles, J., Jr. 5045 Mark Drive Boynton Beach, FL 33437 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Leonard, E. 3213 Canal Drive Boynton Beach, FL 33435 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1995/08] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910832.0 | 28.04.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993US03940 | Priority number, date | US19920880277 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: US 880277 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323931 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639310 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/04 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04B5/00 (KR);
H04W88/022 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVRUFEMPFÄNGER MIT EINER UNIVERSELLEN SYNCHRONISATIONSKODE-BETRIEBSFUNKTION | [1995/08] | English: | SELECTIVE CALL RECEIVER WITH A UNIVERSAL SYNCHRONIZATION CODE OPERATING MODE | [1995/08] | French: | RECEPTEUR D'APPELS SELECTIF AVEC MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT A CODE DE SYNCHRONISATION UNIVERSEL | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/11] | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/11] | Request for further processing for: | 06.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO8805248 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 11,12 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 17 *[A] 1,5,9 | International search | [A]US4506262 (VANCE IAN A W [GB], et al); | [A]US4783654 (ICHIKAWA YOSHIO [JP]); | [A]US4845491 (FASCENDA ANTHONY C [US], et al); | [AE]US5187471 (WAGAI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) |