EP0598081 - METHOD FOR CHANNEL UTILIZATION IN EXTENDED SPECTRUM COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1994/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATSIOKAS, Stelios, J. 9324 NW 18 Street Plantation, FL 33322 / US | 02 /
WADIN, Craig, P. 11015 NW 27 Street Sunrise, FL 33322 / US | 03 /
MARKO, Paul, D. 1996 Denver Street Fort Lauderdale, FL 33326 / US | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1994/21] | Hudson, Peter David MOTOROLA European Intellectual Property Operations Jays Close Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hants RG22 4PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910833.8 | 28.04.1993 | [1994/21] | WO1993US03941 | Priority number, date | US19920879436 | 06.05.1992 Original published format: US 879436 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322868 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598081 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00, H04Q7/00 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
H04M1/72511 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR KANALVERWENDUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT ERWEITERTEM SPEKTRUM | [1994/21] | English: | METHOD FOR CHANNEL UTILIZATION IN EXTENDED SPECTRUM COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [1994/21] | French: | PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN CANAL DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION A SPECTRE ELARGI | [1994/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1994 | Search fee paid | 27.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 01.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/18] | 28.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4980907 (RAITH ALEX K [SE], et al); | [A]US5109527 (AKERBERG DAG E [SE]); | [A]US5109529 (AKAIWA YOSHIHIKO [JP]); | [AP]US5119397 (DAHLIN JAN E A S [SE], et al); | [AP]US5148548 (MECHE PAUL S [US], et al) |