EP0594826 - CATALYTIC REGENERATIVE THERMAL OXIDIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AIR PREHEATER, INC. Andover Road Wellsville, NY 14895 / US | [1994/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYER, Craig, Edward 284 N. Main Wellsville, NY 14895 / US | 02 /
BLAZEJEWSKI, Edward, George 29 Early Street Wellsville, NY 14895 / US | 03 /
BLEDSOE, Carlton, Leo R.D. 2 Fanton Road Wellsville, NY 14895 / US | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 1140 68520 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1994/40] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1994/18] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93911006.0 | 03.05.1993 | [1994/18] | WO1993US04157 | Priority number, date | US19920879934 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: US 879934 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323149 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594826 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594826 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
F23G7/07 (EP,US);
B01D53/8668 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/2013 (EP,US);
F01N3/22 (EP,US);
F01N3/2846 (EP,US);
F01N3/32 (EP,US);
F23G7/063 (EP,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N2310/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/08 (EP,US);
F01N2510/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/18] | B01D53/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE REGENERATIVE THERMISCHE VERBRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1994/18] | English: | CATALYTIC REGENERATIVE THERMAL OXIDIZER | [1994/18] | French: | OXYDANT THERMIQUE A REGENERATION CATALYTIQUE | [1994/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9112878 (LAB KATALIZY STOSOWANEJ SWINGT [PL]); | [X]EP0226203 (POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK INSTYTUT [PL]); | [X]EP0337143 (POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK INSTYTUT [PL]); | [X]EP0037119 (POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK INSTYTUT [PL]) |