EP0667826 - IMPROVED SECURITY SEAL AND LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.J. Brooks Company 164 North 15th Street Newark New Jersey 07107 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states E.J. Brooks Company 164 North 15th Street Newark, New Jersey 07107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGOPOULOS, George 165 Konner Avenue Pine Brook, NJ 07058 / US | 02 /
DREISBACH, Richard, C. 94 Ilford Avenue North Arlington, NJ 07031 / US | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93911279.3 | 12.05.1993 | [1995/34] | WO1993US04510 | Priority number, date | US19920973788 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: US 973788 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411265 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667826 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667826 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/34, F16G11/04 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
G09F3/0358 (EP,US);
F16G11/02 (EP,US);
F16G11/106 (EP,US);
F16G11/108 (EP,US);
F16G11/14 (EP,US);
G09F3/0352 (EP,US);
G09F3/037 (EP,US);
Y10T292/14 (EP,US);
Y10T292/48 (EP,US);
Y10T292/502 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/39] | B65D33/34, F16G11/04, F16G11/10, G09F3/03 | ||
Former IPC [1995/34] | B65D33/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/34] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSIEGEL UND VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1995/34] | English: | IMPROVED SECURITY SEAL AND LOCK | [1995/34] | French: | SERRURE ET FERMETURE DE SECURITE AMELIOREES | [1995/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 16.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1998/19] | FR | 12.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB191301880 (TRIOU ANDRE [FR]) [AD] 1,12 * &GB-A-01880 A.D. 1913 * * the whole document *; | [A]FR2076703 (LAINE JEAN PIERRE) [A] 1,12 * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 8; figures 7,9 *; | [AD]US3770307 (VON GOMPEL J); | [AD]US4216568 (ANDERSON NIGEL I [ZA]); | [A]US4681356 (BRAMMALL TERRENCE N [US]) [A] 1,12 * column W *; | [AD]US5092641 (PENICK JR CLARENCE A [US]) | International search | [A]US918570 (MATHER LEWIS VURNAM [US]); | [A]US3994521 (VAN GOMPEL JAMES); | [A]US4049303 (IRWIN GEORGE, et al); | [A]US4280726 (MCCOAG JOHN); | [A]US4640538 (BRAMMALL TERRENCE N [US]); | [A]US4747631 (LOYNES LESLIE M [US], et al) |