EP0640139 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RECOMBINANT PROTEINS IN STEPTOMYCETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIEPERSBERG, Wolfgang Küllenhahner 218C D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
WEISS, Angela Tauberweg 27 D-97999 Igersheim / DE | 03 /
RÖSSLER, Carola Donaustr.9 D-63110 Rodgau / DE | [1995/17] |
Former [1995/09] | 01 /
PIEPERSBERG, Wolfgang Küllenhahner 218C D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02 /
WEISS, Angela Tauberweg 27 D-97999 Igersheim / DE | |||
03 /
RÖSSLER, Carola Strassweg 15 D-42499 Hückeswagen / DE | Representative(s) | Fouquet, Herbert, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Patentabteilung, Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Fouquet, Herbert, Dr., et al c/o Boehringer Mannheim GmbH, Patentabteilung, Sandhoferstrasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93911444.3 | 03.04.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993EP00833 | Priority number, date | DE19924211517 | 07.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211517 | [1995/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320215 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640139 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640139 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/76, // C12N15/57, C12N15/55, C12N15/56 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
C12N9/2411 (EP,US);
C12N15/76 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12N9/20 (EP,US);
C12N9/2408 (EP,US);
C12N9/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG REKOMBINANTER PROTEINE IN STREPTOMYCETEN | [1995/09] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RECOMBINANT PROTEINS IN STEPTOMYCETES | [1995/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PROTEINES RECOMBINANTES DANS DES STREPTOMYCITES | [1995/09] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.07.1997 | GR | 16.07.1997 | SE | 16.10.1997 | PT | 23.10.1997 | IE | 30.03.1998 | AT | 03.04.1998 | LU | 03.04.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 16.07.1997 | |
GR | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
PT | 23.10.1997 | ||
IE | 30.03.1998 | ||
AT | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 16.07.1997 | |
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
PT | 23.10.1997 | ||
IE | 30.03.1998 | ||
AT | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/21] | GR | 16.07.1997 | |
IE | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
PT | 23.10.1997 | ||
AT | 03.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 16.07.1997 | |
IE | 16.07.1997 | ||
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
PT | 23.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 16.07.1997 | |
SE | 16.10.1997 | ||
PT | 23.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | SE | 16.10.1997 | |
PT | 23.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 16.10.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8807079 (CETUS CORP [US]) | [A] - GENE Bd. 41, 1986, AMSTERDAM NL Seiten E357 - E368 BIBB, M.J. ET AL. 'Cloning and analysis of the promoter region of the erythromycin-resistance gene (ermE) of Streptomyces erythraeus' in der Anmeldung erwähnt | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA Bd. 84, Nr. 8, April 1987, WASHINGTON US Seiten 2130 - 2134 FORNWALD, J. ET AL. 'Two promoters, one inducible and one constitutive, control transcription of the Streptomyces lividans galactose operon' in der Anmeldung erwähnt |