EP0642550 - RADIO FREQUENCY WELDABLE POLYMER ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERRO CORPORATION 1000 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114-1181 / US | [1995/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNDURY, Deenadayalu 6600 Hillsgate Court Newburgh, IN 47630 / US | 02 /
BHATIA, Rajeev, S. 77 Pinney Hill Road, 17 Willington, CT 06279 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912095.2 | 26.03.1993 | [1995/11] | WO1993US02935 | Priority number, date | US19920890759 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: US 890759 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324568 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642550 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/04, C08L23/08, A61J1/00 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,US);
C08L23/0876 (EP,US);
C08L23/0892 (EP,US);
C08L23/18 (EP,US);
C08L23/30 (EP,US);
C08L2312/00 (EP,US);
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1307 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1321 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0853, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1995/11] | C08L33/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | POLYMERGEGENSTÄNDE DIE MITTELS RADIOFREQUENZ SCHWEISSBAR SIND | [1995/11] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY WELDABLE POLYMER ARTICLES | [1995/11] | French: | ARTICLES EN POLYMERE SOUDABLES PAR HAUTE FREQUENCE | [1995/11] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/04] | 08.08.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9216358 (DESMARAIS & FRERE LTD [CA]) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-47 *; | [X]EP0437152 (SOCAPLAST SOC [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 13 - line 21; claims 1-13 *; | [X]EP0247580 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-11 *; | [X]EP0295204 (VIFOR SA [CH]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 27 - line 64; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0444954 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP0232171 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 25; claims 1,23 *; | [X]JPS60199456 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 46, Database accession no. 85-287890, & JPS60199456 A 19851008 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4636412 (FIELD PETER W [AU]); | [YP]US5135785 (MILLON JOEL [FR]); | [Y]US5042176 (RUDY MARION FRANKLIN [US]) |