EP0691942 - HIGH FLEXURAL STRENGTH CARBON FIBER REINFORCED SILICON CARBOXIDE COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUNG, Roger, Yu-Kwan 1308 Salford Drive Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912107.5 | 01.04.1993 | [1996/03] | WO1993US03096 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422780 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691942 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691942 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03C14/00, C04B35/80 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
C04B35/524 (EP);
C03C14/002 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP);
C03C2214/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFFASER VERSTÄRKTER SILICIUM-CARBOXIDE-VERBUNDWERKSTOFF MIT HOHER BIEGEFESTIGKEIT | [1996/03] | English: | HIGH FLEXURAL STRENGTH CARBON FIBER REINFORCED SILICON CARBOXIDE COMPOSITE | [1996/03] | French: | COMPOSITE DE CARBOXYDE DE SILICIUM RENFORCE DE FIBRES DE CARBONE A HAUTE RESISTANCE A LA FLEXION | [1996/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9314040 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4981820 (RENLUND GARY M [US], et al); | [A]DE4033493 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [XA] - F.I.HURWITZ, "POLYMERIC ROUTES TO SILICON CARBIDE AND SILICON OXYCARBIDE CMC", CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEDINGS, (1991), vol. 12, no. 7-8, pages 1292 - 1303, XP000235450 [X] 1 * page 1300, line 1 - line 14 * * the whole document * [A] 2-8 | Examination | - CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEDINGS vol. 12, no. 7-8 1991 pages 1292 - | - 1303 XP235450 F.I.HURWITZ 'POLYMERIC ROUTES TO SILICON CARBIDE AND SILICON OXYCARBIDE CMC' |