EP0634955 - FLUE GAS CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILHELM ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. P.O. Box 516, 3914 East Prospect Street Indianapolis, IN 46203 / US | [1995/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Robert, Allen 6250 Behner Crossing Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | 02 /
WORACEK, David, Luis 29002 19th Avenue South Federal Way, WA 98003 / US | 03 /
BATTLES, Richard, L. 5730 Homestead Drive New Palestine, IN 46163 / US | 04 /
LENTZ, Michael, J. 736 N. Arlington Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46219 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912126.5 | 05.04.1993 | [1995/04] | WO1993US03193 | Priority number, date | US19920864847 | 07.04.1992 Original published format: US 864847 | US19920882835 | 14.05.1992 Original published format: US 882835 | US19920907159 | 01.07.1992 Original published format: US 907159 | US19920919525 | 24.07.1992 Original published format: US 919525 | US19920922576 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: US 922576 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319852 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634955 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B03C3/66, B03C3/36, C01B17/69, B03C3/01 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
B03C3/14 (EP);
B01D53/8609 (EP);
C01B17/803 (EP);
Y02P20/129 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/04] | B03C3/66, B03C3/36, C01B17/69 | Designated contracting states | ES, IT [1995/04] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR HEIZUNGSGAS | [1995/04] | English: | FLUE GAS CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [1995/04] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'UN GAZ DE COMBUSTION | [1995/04] | File destroyed: | 10.08.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/39] | 26.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1457091 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [X] 34-36,38 * page 8, paragraph 2; figure 1; claims 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US3993429 ; | [A]US4333746 ; | [A]US4466815 ; | [A]US4624685 ; | [Y]US4770674 ; | [Y]US4779207 ; | [Y]US4844723 ; | [A]US4931265 ; | [Y]US4987839 ; | [X]US5011516 ; | [Y]US5029535 ; | [Y]US5032154 ; | [Y]CA880086 ; | [Y]CA1178025 |