EP0640008 - THIN-FILM COMPOSITE MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION 10054 Old Grove Road San Diego California 92131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states FLUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION 10054 Old Grove Road San Diego, California 92131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Chinh, Ngoc 13752 Magnolia Street Garden Grove, CA 92644 / US | 02 /
MALDONADO, Adrian, Cernas 169 Date Street Chula Vista, CA 91911 / US | 03 /
SOMANATHAN, Ratnasamy 8310 Yolo Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1995/30] |
Former [1995/09] | 01 /
TRAN, Chinh, Ngoc 13752 Magnolia Street Garden Grove, CA 92644 / US | ||
02 /
MALDONADO, Adrian, Cernas 169 Date Street Chula Vista, CA 91911 / US | |||
03 /
SOMANATHAN, Ratnasamy 1084 Marjorie Drive San Diego, CA 92114 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/09] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912142.2 | 08.04.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993US03280 | Priority number, date | US19920882396 | 13.05.1992 Original published format: US 882396 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323155 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640008 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640008 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/56, // B01D69/12 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
B01D69/125 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | DÜNNFILMVERBUNDMEMBRAN | [1995/09] | English: | THIN-FILM COMPOSITE MEMBRANE | [1995/09] | French: | MEMBRANE COMPOSITE A FILM MINCE | [1995/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.1996 | CH | 11.12.1996 | DK | 11.12.1996 | ES | 11.12.1996 | IT | 11.12.1996 | LI | 11.12.1996 | SE | 11.03.1997 | DE | 12.03.1997 | IE | 08.04.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
IT | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
DE | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
IT | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
DE | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
DE | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
DE | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
DE | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
DE | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | DE | 12.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2602493 (RAMOT PLASTICS [IL]); | [A]EP0014054 (MIDWEST RESEARCH INST [US]); | [A]EP0361092 (HYDRANAUTICS [US]); | [A]WO9010494 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 324 (C-320)(2047) 19 December 1985 |