EP0587880 - ENTITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH REMOTE CALL FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1994/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUTT, Colin 14 Crusade Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
SWIST, James, Anthony 66 Coolidge Road Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912191.9 | 02.04.1993 | [1994/12] | WO1993US03402 | Priority number, date | US19920864802 | 07.04.1992 Original published format: US 864802 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320508 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587880 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/40 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G06F9/547 (EP,US);
G06F9/4484 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/12] | Title | German: | OBJEKT/RESOURCEN-MANAGEMENT-SYSTEM MIT FERNPROZEDURAUFRUF | [1994/12] | English: | ENTITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH REMOTE CALL FEATURE | [1994/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION D'ENTITE PRESENTANT UNE CARACTERISTIQUE D'APPEL A DISTANCE | [1994/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/34] | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0414624 (IBM [US]) | [X] - ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS vol. 2, no. 1, 1 February 1984, NEW YORK, US pages 39 - 59 A.D.BIRRELL ET AL. 'Implementing Remote Procedure Calls' | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 34, no. 8, January 1992, NEW YORK US pages 380 - 381 'Showing all Service Group and Configuration File References to a Remote Procedure Call Object' |