EP0636284 - POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.P.M. INDUSTRIES PTY LIMITED 4 Hill Street Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Koichi 16 Ethel Street Vaucluse, NSW 2030 / AU | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912465.7 | 28.06.1993 | [1995/05] | WO1993AU00315 | Priority number, date | AU1993PL06811 | 14.01.1993 Original published format: AU PL681193 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9416492 | Date: | 21.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636284 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636284 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.07.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/12, H02M5/45, H02M5/451, H02M5/452, H05B41/24 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
H02M1/425 (EP,US);
H02M7/537 (EP,US);
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
H05B41/285 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERSORGUNG | [1995/05] | English: | POWER SUPPLY | [1995/05] | French: | ALIMENTATION EN PUISSANCE | [1995/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 27.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE OSRAM Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE OSRAM GmbH Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 05.07.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.10.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.11.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.1998 | BE | 26.08.1998 | CH | 26.08.1998 | FR | 26.08.1998 | IT | 26.08.1998 | LI | 26.08.1998 | NL | 26.08.1998 | DK | 26.11.1998 | PT | 26.11.1998 | SE | 26.11.1998 | DE | 27.11.1998 | ES | 27.11.1998 | IE | 28.06.1999 | LU | 28.06.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
FR | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
ES | 27.11.1998 | ||
IE | 28.06.1999 | ||
LU | 28.06.1999 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
ES | 27.11.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
IE | 28.06.1999 | ||
LU | 28.06.1999 | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
ES | 27.11.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
IE | 28.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
DK | 26.11.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
IE | 28.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
NL | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
IE | 28.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
IE | 28.06.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
SE | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
PT | 26.11.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
BE | 26.08.1998 | ||
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/24] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | ||
DE | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 26.08.1998 | |
CH | 26.08.1998 | ||
LI | 26.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5846868 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830609), vol. 7, no. 132, Database accession no. (E - 180), & JP58046868 A 19830318 (TOUSHIBA DENZAI) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [XY]AU4285172 (BORG WARNER); | [XY]GB2022943 (SIEMENS AG); | [XY]GB2133940 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [XY]US4745539 (NILSSEN OLE K [US]); | [A]AU2163492 | Examination | EP0043112 |