EP0601148 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DELAYING THE RUN-OFF OF FLASH-STORM WATER OR ORDINARY RAINWATER FROM ROOFS AND OTHER SURFACES WITH A WATER-RETENTION CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nill, Werner Eigenheimweg 45 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1994/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILL, Werner Eigenheimweg 45 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
MOSBAEK, Johannessen Aspevej 6 Stroby Egede DK-4600 Koge / DK | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 CH-8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 93912535.7 | 29.06.1993 | [1994/24] | WO1993CH00165 | Priority number, date | CH19920002068 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: CH 206892 | [1994/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400653 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601148 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601148 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/04 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
E04D13/0409 (EP,US);
E04D2013/0422 (EP,US);
E04D2013/0427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [1994/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERZÖGERTEN ABFLUSS DES METEOR- ODER REGENWASSERS VON DÄCHERN UND FLÄCHEN MIT RÜCKSTAUKAPAZITÄT | [1994/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DELAYING THE RUN-OFF OF FLASH-STORM WATER OR ORDINARY RAINWATER FROM ROOFS AND OTHER SURFACES WITH A WATER-RETENTION CAPABILITY | [1994/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ECOULEMENT DIFFERE DE PLUIES DILUVIENNES ET D'EAU DE PLUIE PROVENANT DE TOITS ET DE SURFACES AYANT LA CAPACITE DE RETENIR LES EAUX | [1994/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.02.1998 | FR | 11.02.1998 | GB | 11.02.1998 | GR | 11.02.1998 | IT | 11.02.1998 | NL | 11.02.1998 | DK | 11.05.1998 | PT | 11.05.1998 | AT | 29.06.1998 | LU | 29.06.1998 | BE | 30.06.1998 | IE | 24.09.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | ES | 11.02.1998 | |
GB | 11.02.1998 | ||
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
NL | 11.02.1998 | ||
DK | 11.05.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
AT | 29.06.1998 | ||
LU | 29.06.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 11.02.1998 | |
GB | 11.02.1998 | ||
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
NL | 11.02.1998 | ||
DK | 11.05.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
AT | 29.06.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
LU | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 11.02.1998 | |
GB | 11.02.1998 | ||
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
NL | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
AT | 29.06.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
LU | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 11.02.1998 | |
GB | 11.02.1998 | ||
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
AT | 29.06.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
LU | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
AT | 29.06.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
LU | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IE | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
AT | 29.06.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
LU | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
GR | 11.02.1998 | ||
IE | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
LU | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
IE | 11.02.1998 | ||
IT | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
IE | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
BE | 30.06.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
IE | 11.02.1998 | ||
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 11.02.1998 | |
PT | 11.05.1998 | ||
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | PT | 11.05.1998 | |
FR | 10.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | PT | 11.05.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2618356 (AARON MATHEIS); | [X]DE1806527 (JOSAM MFG CO); | [X]US4400272 (LOGSDON DUANE D [US]) |