EP0654149 - POSITIVE-ACTING RADIATION-SENSITIVE MIXTURE AND RECORDING MATERIAL PRODUCED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENGENROTH, Horst Schlosswiesenstrasse 31 D-56457 Westerburg / DE | 02 /
SPIESS, Walter Rheingaustrasse 20 D-64807 Dieburg / DE | 03 /
BUHR, Gerhard Am Erdbeerstein 28 D-61462 Königstein / DE | 04 /
RÖSCHERT, Horst Am Pfingstborn 16 D-55437 Ober-Hilbersheim / DE | 05 /
PAWLOWSKI, Georg Fritz-Kalle-Strasse 34 D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE | 06 /
FUCHS, Jürgen Flörsheimer Strasse 40 D-65439 Flörsheim / DE | [1995/21] | Application number, filing date | 93912903.7 | 07.06.1993 | [1995/21] | WO1993EP01431 | Priority number, date | DE19924225830 | 05.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4225830 | [1995/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403837 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654149 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654149 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, C07C315/04 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP);
G03F7/004 (KR);
C08K5/42 (EP);
C09D125/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/42, C08L25/18 (EP);
C09D125/18, C08L2666/28 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/21] | Title | German: | POSITIV-ARBEITENDES STRAHLUNGSEMPFINDLICHES GEMISCH UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTES AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL | [1995/21] | English: | POSITIVE-ACTING RADIATION-SENSITIVE MIXTURE AND RECORDING MATERIAL PRODUCED THEREWITH | [1995/21] | French: | MELANGE SENSIBLE AU RAYONNEMENT, A FONCTION POSITIVE, ET MATERIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT FABRIQUE AVEC CE MELANGE | [1995/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1204495 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) | [Y] - CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY Bd. 58, Nr. 6, 15 Maerz 1978, R.F. LANGLER ET AL. "The photochemistry of benzylic sulfonyl compounds : The preparation of sulfones and sulfinic acids" in der Anmeldung erwaehnt | Examination | DE4111060 |