EP0643582 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUPERNATANT OF ACTIVATED THROMBOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A SUPERNATANT OF ACTIVATED THROMBOCYTES, METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING THE DEVICE AND SUPERNATANT OBTAINED | ||
[1998/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INOTEB Le Guernol F-56920 Saint-Gonnery / FR | [1995/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELMAS, Olivier, Marcel, Joseph 20, square Maurice Ravel Longpont-sur-Orge F-91310 Montlhery / FR | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Tonnellier, Jean-Claude Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Tonnellier, Jean-Claude Nony & Associés, 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93913100.9 | 07.06.1993 | [1995/12] | WO1993FR00544 | Priority number, date | FR19920006826 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9206826 | [1995/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325215 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643582 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643582 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/14, A61M1/36 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
A61M1/0218 (EP,US);
A61K35/19 (EP,US);
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0427 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0427, A61M2202/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHALTUNG EINER UEBERSTANDSFRAKTION VON AKTIVIERTEN THROMBOZYTEN | [1998/33] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUPERNATANT OF ACTIVATED THROMBOCYTES | [1998/33] | French: | PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'UN SURNAGEANT DE THROMBOCYTES ACTIVES | [1998/33] |
Former [1995/12] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHALTUNG EINES UBERSTANDSFRAKTION VON AKTIVIERTENTHROMBOZYTEN UND ERHALTENE UBERSTANDSFRAKTION. | ||
Former [1995/12] | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A SUPERNATANT OF ACTIVATED THROMBOCYTES, METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING THE DEVICE AND SUPERNATANT OBTAINED | ||
Former [1995/12] | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT L'OBTENTION D'UN SURNAGEANT DE THROMBOCYTES ACTIVES, PROCEDE METTANT EN UVRE LE DISPOSITIF ET SURNAGEANT OBTENU | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 12.08.1998 | PT | 12.11.1998 | [2001/23] |
Former [1999/29] | PT | 12.11.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4360435 (BELLAMY DAVID, et al); | [Y]FR2513896 (COBE LAB [US]); | [X]US4410630 (ZIERDT CHARLES H [US]); | [Y]US4618494 (ANGERS JOHN W [US]); | [Y]WO8607279 (ADRIA [FR]); | [Y]WO9007931 (CURATECH INC [US]); | [X]EP0349188 |