EP0610508 - METHOD OF DETECTING MISFIRE BY UTILIZING VARIATION OF ROTATION OF CRANKSHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Takuya, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Toru, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 03 /
MIYAKE, Mitsuhiro, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Yasuhisa, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 05 /
YANAGISAWA, Mitsuhiko, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo KK 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 06 /
NAKAJIMA, Hiroyuki, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 07 /
NAMIKI, Koichi, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | 08 /
KASAI, Satoshi, Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K. K. 33--8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93913490.4 | 08.06.1993 | [1994/33] | WO1993JP00765 | Priority number, date | JP19920149431 | 09.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14943192 | JP19930028215 | 17.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2821593 | [1994/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325810 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610508 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610508 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02D45/00, F02P17/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
F02D41/22 (EP,US);
F02D45/00 (KR);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US);
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
G01M15/11 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FEHLZÜNDUNGEN DURCH DREHZAHLÄNDERUNG DER KURBELWELLE | [1994/33] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING MISFIRE BY UTILIZING VARIATION OF ROTATION OF CRANKSHAFT | [1994/33] | French: | METHODE DE DETECTION DES RATES D'ALLUMAGE EN UTILISANT LES FLUCTUATIONS DE ROTATION DU VILEBREQUIN | [1994/33] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/14: Teilanmeldung 95203468.4 eingereicht am 13/12/95 | EPB 1996/14: Divisional application 95203468.4 filed on 13/12/95 | EPB 1996/14: Demande divisionnaire 95203468.4 déposée le 13/12/95 | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1994 | Translation filed | 21.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1994 | Search fee paid | 21.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95203468.4 / EP0708234 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 16.05.1994 | Date of receipt | 23.06.1994 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04101071 ; | [Y]US5056360 (DOSDALL JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 64 - column 8, line 17; figure - *; | [Y]US5117681 (DOSDALL JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1* column W *; | [PX]WO9307497 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1,11,12 * page 3, line 2 - line 21 * * page 5, line 2 - page 9, line 2 * * page 11, line 6 - line 19 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920722), vol. 16, no. 339, Database accession no. (M - 1284), & JP04101071 A 19920402 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6357616B ; | [A]JPH0466755 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH04203341 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST); | [A]JPH0518311 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |