EP0649671 - CHAIR FOR GAME MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA ACE DENKEN 12-9, Higashi Ueno 3-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA ACE DENKEN 12-9, Higashi Ueno 3-chome Taito-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEMOTO, Takatoshi Kabushiki Kaisha Ace Denken 12-6, Higashi Ueno 3-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | 02 /
TSURUMI, Masayuki Kabushiki Kaisha Ace Denken 12-6, Higashi Ueno 3-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93913601.6 | 29.06.1993 | [1995/17] | WO1993JP00887 | Priority number, date | JP19920171229 | 29.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17122992 | [1995/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400206 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649671 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63F7/02, A63F9/22, G07F17/32 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
A47C7/72 (EP,US);
A63F7/02 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/245 (US);
A63F13/285 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/98 (EP,KR);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3216 (EP,US);
G09B9/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/17] | A63F7/02, A63F9/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/17] | Title | German: | STUHL FÜR SPIELAUTOMAT | [1995/17] | English: | CHAIR FOR GAME MACHINE | [1995/17] | French: | SIEGE POUR APPAREIL DE JEU | [1995/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1995 | Translation filed | 12.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1995 | Search fee paid | 12.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 03.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/16] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2002 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2003 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4001838 (ADP AUTOMATEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5* column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 19; figure . *; | [E]US5326104 (PEASE LOGAN L [US], et al) [E] 1 * column 7, line 6 - line 34; figure 5 * | International search | [Y]JPS5353007U ; | [Y]JPS6148786U ; | [Y]JPS63135188 (MIMURA KENJI); | [Y]JPS63311982 (NAX KK, et al); | [Y]JPH0432781U ; | [YP]JPH04128787U |