EP0642436 - SULKY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLOTECH AS c/o Kjell Landaas, Kvitmyrvn. 10 N-4027 Stavanger / NO | [1995/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPJON, Jan Toppen Gard N-1464 Fagerstrand / NO | 02 /
NYGAARDSVIK, Atle Skaugumveien 8 N-1458 Fjellstrand / NO | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1995/11] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 93913640.4 | 27.05.1993 | [1995/11] | WO1993NO00085 | Priority number, date | NO19920002156 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: NO 922156 | [1995/11] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324354 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642436 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642436 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62C1/08 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
B62C1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, IT, NL, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | SULKY | [1995/11] | English: | SULKY | [1995/11] | French: | SULKY | [1995/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1993 | Translation filed | 23.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.01.1997 | BE | 08.01.1997 | NL | 08.01.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1997/49] | AT | 08.01.1997 | |
BE | 08.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 08.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [XA]SE8202219 ; | [A]SE350738 (WEBER W, et al) |