EP0640239 - INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROOKS SUPPORT SYSTEMS, INC. 6546 Pound Road Williamson, NY 14589 / US | [1995/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOKS, Raymond, J. 7211 Furnace Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | 02 /
GAY, John, M. 364 French Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 03 /
WEIR, Bruce, A. 420 Haley Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | 04 /
McENTEE, Paul, E. 61 Bell Mawr Drive Rochester, NY 14624 / US | 05 /
BLOOD, Lauren 3832 Center Street Livonia Center, NY 14488 / US | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [1995/09] | Hill, Richard, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93913872.3 | 13.05.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993US04561 | Priority number, date | US19920882847 | 14.05.1992 Original published format: US 882847 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323853 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640239 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/00, F16M13/04, F16M11/28, F16M11/18 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
G21C17/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16M11/28 (EP,KR,US);
F16M11/10 (EP,KR,US);
F16M11/18 (EP,KR,US);
F16M11/2014 (EP,KR,US);
F16M11/245 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | PRÜFGERÄT | [1995/09] | English: | INSPECTION DEVICE | [1995/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE | [1995/09] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/01] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2443016 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,4 * figures 1-4; claim 1 * [A] 5,7,10; | [A]US4505874 (WARREN DOUGLAS H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,10* column 3 - column 4; figures 1-2 *; | [YA]US4638667 (ZIMMER JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-4 * [A] 5-7,9,10 | International search | [XY]US3780571 (WIESENER R); | [XY]US5065249 (HORN DONALD N [US], et al) |