EP0641301 - STILBENE DERIVATIVES AS ANTICANCER AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH CORPORATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 101 North Wilmot Road, Suite 600 Tucson, Arizona 85711-3335 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states Research Corporation Technologies, Inc. 101 North Wilmot Road, Suite 600 Tucson Arizona 85711-3335 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUSHMAN, Mark, S. 1715 Maywood Drive West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
HAMEL, Ernest 5200 Benton Avenue Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93914032.3 | 20.05.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993US04807 | Priority number, date | US19920887725 | 21.05.1992 Original published format: US 887725 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323357 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641301 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/215, A61K31/09, C07C43/225, C07C43/23, C07C69/157, C07C49/84, C07C205/35, C07C217/58 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP);
C07C205/35 (EP);
C07C217/18 (EP);
C07C217/58 (EP);
C07C217/80 (EP);
C07C217/84 (EP);
C07C219/10 (EP);
C07C233/25 (EP);
C07C235/34 (EP);
C07C235/56 (EP);
C07C251/16 (EP);
C07C255/37 (EP);
C07C323/18 (EP);
C07C323/36 (EP);
C07C43/2055 (EP);
C07C43/215 (EP);
C07C43/225 (EP);
C07C43/23 (EP);
C07C45/46 (EP);
C07C45/71 (EP);
C07C47/575 (EP);
C07C49/755 (EP);
C07C49/84 (EP);
C07C59/64 (EP);
C07C65/21 (EP);
C07C69/017 (EP);
C07C69/708 (EP);
C07D217/20 (EP);
C07D455/00 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP);
C07C2602/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/46, C07C49/755 (EP);
C07C45/46, C07C49/84 (EP);
C07C45/71, C07C47/575 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1995/10] | Title | German: | STILBENDERIVATE ALS ANTIKREBSMITTEL | [1995/10] | English: | STILBENE DERIVATIVES AS ANTICANCER AGENTS | [1995/10] | French: | DERIVES DE STILBENE UTILISES COMME AGENTS ANTICANCEREUX | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 03.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/24] | 07.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2336923 | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 34, no. 8, August 1991, WASHINGTON US pages 2579 - 2588 M. CUSHMAN ET AL 'SYNTHESIS AND EVALUATION OF STILBENE AND DIHYDROSTILBENE DERIVATIVES AS POTENTIAL ANTICANCER AGENTS THAT INHIBIT TUBULIN POLYMERIZATION' | [X] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY. vol. 31, no. 2, February 1966, EASTON US pages 516 - 520 S. KUBOTA ET AL 'THE STRUCTURE AND TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF TAKATONINE' | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 24, no. 11, November 1981, WASHINGTON US pages 1348 - 1353 P. JACOB III ET AL 'SULFUR ANALOGUES OF PSYCHOMIMETIC AGENTS. MONOTHIO ANALOGUES OF MESCALINE AND ISOMESCALINE' | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 15, 13 October 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 134202n, S. AL-KHALIL ET AL 'THE SYNTHESIS OF THALMICRINONE, A CONFIRMATION OF STRUCTURE' page 704 ;column 2 ; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 5, 31 July 1972, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 28799f, Y. ISHIDA ET AL 'TAKATONINE RELATED COMPOUNDS. THEIR PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTION ON SMOOTH MUSCLE' page 15 ;column 2 ; | [X] - 'CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS ELEVENTH COLLECTIVE INDEX, CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES, OXYCELODEX-PHENOL, BUTYL' , AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY | [XP] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 35, no. 12, 12 June 1992, WASHINGTON US pages 2293 - 2306 M. CUSHMAN ET AL 'SYNTHESIS AND EVALUATION OF ANALOGUES OF (Z)-1-(4-METHOXYPHENYL)-2 (3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYPHENYL)ETHENE AS POTENTIAL CYTOTOXIC AND ANTIMITOTIC AGENTS' |