EP0644786 - PSYCHOTHERAPY APPARATUS FOR TREATING UNDESIRABLE EMOTIONAL AROUSAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEATHERS, Lawrence, R. West 1525 - 8th Avenue, Suite 205 Spokane, WA 99204 / US | [1995/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 93914210.5 | 27.05.1993 | [1995/13] | WO1993US05062 | Priority number, date | US19920891696 | 01.06.1992 Original published format: US 891696 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324171 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644786 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M21/00 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
A61M21/00 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0044 (EP,US);
A61M2021/005 (EP,US);
A61M2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2230/42 (EP,US);
A61M2230/65 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/13] | Title | German: | PSYCHOTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON UNERWÜNSCHTEN EMOTIONALEN ZUSTÄNDEN | [1995/13] | English: | PSYCHOTHERAPY APPARATUS FOR TREATING UNDESIRABLE EMOTIONAL AROUSAL | [1995/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE PSYCHOTHERAPIE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER L'EVEIL D'UN ETAT EMOTIONNEL INDESIRABLE | [1995/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 17.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/30] | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3585991 (BALAMUTH LEWIS)[A] 8-11; | [X]US4315502 (GORGES DENIS E) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 57 - line 68 * * column 4, line 47 - line 61 * * column 7, line 3 - line 30 * * figure - *; | [A]US4762131 (OKUDA SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1 | International search | [A]DE888601 (REISS BRUNHILDE GEB GROHMANN [DE]); | [A]US3826250 (ADAMS H); | [A]US4140997 (BRADY WILLIAM M); | [A]US4282864 (PIZER ROBERT S); | [A]US4289121 (KUPRIYANOVICH LEONID I); | [A]US4354505 (SHIGA KAZUMASA); | [A]US4388918 (FILLEY CHARLES C [US]); | [A]DE3447105 (FISCHER WILFRIED); | [A]US4640266 (LEVY ZUBIN [US]); | [A]US4665926 (LEUNER HANSCARL [DE], et al); | [A]US4777937 (RUSH CHARLES [US], et al); | [A]US4902274 (GLEESON III WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US5036858 (CARTER JOHN L [US], et al) |