EP0646080 - ROTARY SLIDE VALVE FOR ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1998 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Postfach 25 20 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG Postfach 25 20 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG Postfach 25 20 D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAREIS, Helmut In der Beinge 4 D-7071 Eschach / DE | 02 /
RUF, Gerhard Buchenweg 9 D-7088 Hüttlingen / DE | [1995/14] | Application number, filing date | 93914680.9 | 21.06.1993 | [1995/14] | WO1993EP01570 | Priority number, date | DE19924220624 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4220624 | [1995/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400329 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646080 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646080 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0646080 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/083 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
B62D5/0835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/14] | Title | German: | DREHSCHIEBERVENTIL, INSBESONDERE FÜR HILFSKRAFTLENKUNGEN | [1995/14] | English: | ROTARY SLIDE VALVE FOR ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEMS | [1995/14] | French: | VANNE A TIROIR ROTATIF, NOTAMMENT POUR DIRECTIONS ASSISTEES | [1995/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE TRW Fahrwerksysteme GmbH & Co. KG Hansa-Allee 190 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rausch, Michael, et al, et al Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/48] | 14.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.03.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.02.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.02.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.08.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0468659 (TRW INC [US]); | [X]GB2212463 (BURMAN & SONS LTD [GB]); | [X]US4819545 (DYMOND RICHARD W [US]) |