EP0648265 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HARBORING A YEAST ARTIFICIAL CHROMOSOME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GenPharm International, Inc. 297 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1995/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Theodore 506 Almer Street, No. 4 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
LORING, Jeanne, F. 1171 Rickover Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
KAY, Robert, M. 2127 Broadway Street, No. 5 San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/16] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93915422.5 | 18.06.1993 | [1995/16] | WO1993US05873 | Priority number, date | US19920900972 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: US 900972 | US19930001493 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: US 1493 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400569 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648265 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/88, C12N15/12, A01K67/027, C07K15/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
C12N15/88 (EP);
A01K67/0276 (EP);
A01K67/0278 (EP);
C07K14/4711 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP);
C12N15/8509 (EP);
A01K2207/15 (EP);
A01K2217/00 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A01K2217/075 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0306 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/16] | C12N15/00, C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NICHT-HUMANEN TRANSGENEN TIEREN DIE EIN ARTIFIZIELLES HEFE CHROMOSOM ENTHALTEN | [1995/16] | English: | METHODS FOR PRODUCING TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HARBORING A YEAST ARTIFICIAL CHROMOSOME | [1995/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES NON-HUMAINS ABRITANT UN CHROMOSOME ARTIFICIEL DE LEVURE | [1995/16] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1995 | Search fee paid | 17.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 08.01.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - STRAUSS WM ET AL, "Molecular complementation of a collagen mutation in mammalian cells using yeast artificial chromosomes.", EMBO J, FEB 1992, 11 (2) P417-22, ENGLAND, XP002014856 [Y] 1-6,10-12,16,17,20-25 * the whole document * | [Y] - SU ZZ ET AL, "TRANSFER OF A DOMINANT-ACTING TUMOR-INDUCING ONCOGENE FROM HUMAN PROSTATIC-CARCINOMA CELLS TO CLONED RAT EMBRYO FIBROBLAST CELLS BY DNA-TRANSFECTION", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, 1992, 12, 297-304, XP002014857 [Y] 1-6,10-12,16,17,20-25 * the whole document * | [A] - HADLACZKY G ET AL, "CENTROMERE FORMATION IN MOUSE CELLS COTRANSFORMED WITH HUMAN DNA AND A DOMINANT MARKER GENE", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, 88 (18). 1991. 8106-8110., XP002014858 [A] 1-31 | [PX] - CHOI TK ET AL, "Transgenic mice containing a human heavy chain immunoglobulin gene fragment cloned in a yeast artificial chromosome [published erratum appears in Nat Genet 1993 Jul;4(3):320]", NAT GENET, JUN 1993, 4 (2) P117-23, UNITED STATES, XP002014859 [PX] 1,11,16,17,20,22,28-31 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]US5175384 ; | [XP]US5175385 ; | [XY]US4873191 ; | [XY]US4736866 | [XP] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 20, No. 12, issued December 1992, SCHEDL et al., "Transgenic Mice Generated by Pronuclear Injection of a Yeast Artificial Chromosome", pages 3073-3077, see entire document. | [XY] - Ann. Rev. Genet., Volume 20, issued 1986, PALMITER et al., "Germ-Line Transformation of Mice", pages 465-499, see the entire document. | [Y] - The EMBO Journal, Volume 10, No. 7, issued 1991, GMIRKE et al., "Cloning and in Vivo Expression of the Human GART Gene Using Yeast Artificial Chromosome", pages 1629-1634, see the entire document. | [Y] - Genomics, Volume 7, issued 1990, D'URSO et al., "Human Glucose-6-Phosphate Dehydrogenase Gene Carried on a Yeast Artificial Chromosome Encodes Active Enzyme in Monkey Cells", pages 531-534, see the entire document. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 84, issued November 1987, FELGNER et al., "Lipofection: a Highly Efficient, Lipid Anediated DNA-Transfection Procedure", pages 7413-7417, see entire document and especially page 7414. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 83, issued December 1986, GOSSLER et al., "Transgenesis by Means of Blastocyst-Derived Embryonic Stem Cell Lines", pages 9065-9069, see the entire document. | [XY] - The EMBO Journal, Volume 11, No. 2, issued 1991, STRAUSS et al., "Molecular Complementation of a Collagen Mutation in Mammalian Cells Using Yeast Artificial Chromosomes", pages 417-422, see entire document. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 352, issued 18 July 1991, QUON et al., "Formation of Beta-Kemyloid Protein Deposits in Brains of Transgenic Mice", pages 239-241, see entire document. |