EP0648334 - IMMUNOASSAY USING DYE COMPLEXED ENZYME CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUIDEL CORPORATION 10165 McKellar Court San Diego, California 92121 / US | [1995/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLAK, Jan 381 Via Almansa Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
ROWLEY, Gerald, L. 9264 Lethbridge Way, San Diego California 92129 / US | 03 /
PRONOVOST, Allan, D. 12864 Salmon River Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1995/44] |
Former [1995/16] | 01 /
PAWLAK, Jan 381 Via Almansa Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | ||
02 /
ROWLEY, Gerald, L. 11767 Stoney Peak Drive, 324 San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
03 /
PRONOVOST, Allan, D. 12864 Salmon River Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/16] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93915505.7 | 01.07.1993 | [1995/16] | WO1993US06276 | Priority number, date | US19920907985 | 02.07.1992 Original published format: US 907985 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401775 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648334 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/58, G01N33/558 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/581 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/16] | G01N33/544, G01N33/542, G01N33/536 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1995/16] | Title | German: | IMMUNOASSAY UNTER VERWENDUNG FARBSTOFFKOMPLEXIERTER ENZYMKONJUGATE | [1995/16] | English: | IMMUNOASSAY USING DYE COMPLEXED ENZYME CONJUGATES | [1995/16] | French: | DOSAGES IMMUNOLOGIQUES AU MOYEN DE CONJUGUES ENZYMATIQUES COLORES COMPLEXES | [1995/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 15.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.12.1994 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/46] | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0250676 (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [Y]GB2204398 (UNILEVER PLC); | [XY]US4786589 (ROUNDS DONALD E [US]); | [Y]US4861711 (FRIESEN HEINZ-JUERGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US4943522 (EISINGER ROBERT W [US], et al); | [XP]US5137804 (GREENE RICHARD A [US], et al) | [Y] - Analytical Biochemistry, Volume 169, issued 1988, H. YASUE et al., "Enhancement of the Sensitivity for in Situ Detection of Alkaline Phosphatase Using a Homopolymer of 2-Acrylamide 2-Methylpropanesulfonate", pages 410-414, especially page 411. |