EP0656981 - STORAGE SYSTEM FOR THE ENTRY AND EXIT OF ITEMS, ESPECIALLY MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trauten, Karl Nerotal 2 55286 Wörrstadt / DE | [1998/28] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Trauten, Karl Nerotal 2 D-55286 Wörrstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUM, Albert 3, chemin de Chènes CH-2072 S.-Blaise / CH | 02 /
TRAUTEN, Karl Nerotal 2 D-55286 Wörrstadt / DE | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Stachow, Ernst-Walther, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Stachow, Ernst-Walther, Prof. Dr., et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 D-51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93915672.5 | 24.07.1993 | [1995/24] | WO1993DE00667 | Priority number, date | DE19924224855 | 28.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224855 | [1995/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9402699 | Date: | 03.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656981 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656981 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/18, E04H6/42 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
E04H6/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | LAGERSYSTEM ZUM EIN- UND AUSLAGERN VON LAGERGÜTERN, INSBESONDERE KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1995/24] | English: | STORAGE SYSTEM FOR THE ENTRY AND EXIT OF ITEMS, ESPECIALLY MOTOR VEHICLES | [1995/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE POUR LE STOCKAGE ET LE DESTOCKAGE D'OBJETS A ENTREPOSER, EN PARTICULIER DE VEHICULES A MOTEUR | [1995/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 08.07.1998 | IE | 08.07.1998 | IT | 08.07.1998 | NL | 08.07.1998 | LU | 24.07.1998 | BE | 31.07.1998 | DK | 08.10.1998 | PT | 08.10.1998 | SE | 08.10.1998 | ES | 19.01.1999 | MC | 31.01.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/38] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
NL | 08.07.1998 | ||
LU | 24.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
DK | 08.10.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
ES | 19.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
NL | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
DK | 08.10.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
ES | 19.01.1999 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
NL | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
DK | 08.10.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2003/18] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
NL | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
NL | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 01.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
NL | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2002/11] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/01] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
IE | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 08.07.1998 | |
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 31.07.1998 | |
PT | 08.10.1998 | ||
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
FR | 04.12.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 08.10.1998 | |
SE | 08.10.1998 | ||
FR | 04.12.1998 | ||
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/26] | FR | 04.12.1998 | |
MC | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 04.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2712875 (LEON LEOPOLD) [A] 1; | [A]US3136431 (COLBERT CHARLES R) [A] 1,2,3; | [A]US3616945 (GYNNE NILS A S) [A] 1-4,7,10; | [Y]US3896955 (COLLINS EARL R, et al) [Y] 1,2,3,6,8,9; | [A]DE3902080 (EVERS FRANZ [DE])[A] 10,11; | [A]EP0412805 (GUERRA JOSE RIBEIRO [PT]) [A] 1,3,4; | [A]WO9106731 (ROSSI GERMANO [IT]) [A] 1,3,4; | [Y]EP0478070 (COENCO SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1,2,3,6,8,9 |