EP0658247 - LIQUID VOLUME MEASURING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURGEE LIMITED 47 South Mall Cork / IE | [1995/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SISK, Henry, Benjamin Waterstown Sallins County Kildare / IE | 02 /
MADDEN, John, James 26 Broadford Lawn Ballinteer Dublin 14 / IE | 03 /
O'SULLIVAN, Niall, Anthony 7 Thomas Street Dublin 8 / IE | 04 /
COMERFORD, Kieran, Anthony 50 Wilson Road Mount Merrion County Dublin / IE | 05 /
HOOD, Oliver, St. Clair 61 Wellington Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 54, Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 93916132.9 | 30.07.1993 | [1995/25] | WO1993IE00043 | Priority number, date | IE19920002520 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: IE 922520 | IE19930000259 | 01.04.1993 Original published format: IE 930259 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9403781 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658247 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658247 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01F19/00, G01F25/00 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
G01F17/00 (EP,US);
G01F19/00 (EP,US);
G01F23/0053 (EP,US);
G01F23/02 (EP,US);
G01F25/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSVOLUMENMESSVORRICHTUNG | [1995/25] | English: | LIQUID VOLUME MEASURING APPARATUS | [1995/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'UN VOLUME DE LIQUIDE | [1995/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2000 | CH | 15.03.2000 | GR | 15.03.2000 | IT | 15.03.2000 | LI | 15.03.2000 | NL | 15.03.2000 | SE | 15.03.2000 | DK | 15.06.2000 | PT | 15.06.2000 | LU | 30.07.2000 | MC | 31.07.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
GR | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
DK | 15.06.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
LU | 30.07.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
GR | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
DK | 15.06.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
DK | 15.06.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 15.03.2000 | |
LI | 15.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1839809 (WORCESTER SMITH HARRY) [A] 65 * column W *; | [A]US2696738 (LUPFER GEORGE L) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]CH550390 (SHEPHERD PETER SCOTT) [A] 65* the whole document *; | [A]US4033190 (HUDSPETH HENRY S) [A] 65,94-96 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 7 *; | [XY]DE3306631 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH) [X] 101,102 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4; figure . * [Y] 1,3,9,10,23,24,32-34,38,63,64; | [XY]US4706053 (GIAVARINI ANDREA [IT]) [X] 101,102 * column W * [Y] 1-3,9,10,23,24,32-34,38,63,64; | [A]DE3940636 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DYA]EP0472363 (BATESTOWN LTD [IE]) [DY] 1-3,9,10,23,24,32-34,38,63,64 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 15; figure 8 * [A] 65,70-80,87-93,98,99 | Examination | US1377577 | US4928514 |