EP0682765 - COMBINED COMBUSTION AND EXHAUST GAS CLEANSING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAL AB Smultronvägen 12 S-782 00 Malung / SE | [1995/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMLÖF, Göran Smultronvägen 12 S-782 00 Malung / SE | 02 /
LILLIEHÖÖK, Folke Starvägen 4 S-230 10 Skanör / SE | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Waldinger, Ake AKE WALDINGER PATENTING Vällingbyvägen 57 162 63 Vällingby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Waldinger, Ake Roslinvägen 41 S-161 55 Bromma / SE | Application number, filing date | 93916364.8 | 13.07.1993 | [1995/47] | WO1993SE00626 | Priority number, date | SE19920002155 | 13.07.1992 Original published format: SE 9202155 | [1995/47] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401724 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682765 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682765 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F23J15/00, B01D53/00, // B01D53/34, F23L7/00, B01D5/00 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
B01D53/22 (EP,US);
B01D5/0045 (EP,US);
B01D53/002 (EP,US);
F02C3/36 (EP,US);
F23J15/02 (EP,US);
F23J15/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/47] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR KOMBINIERTEN VERBRENNUNG UND ABGASREINIGUNG | [1995/47] | English: | COMBINED COMBUSTION AND EXHAUST GAS CLEANSING PLANT | [1995/47] | French: | INSTALLATION COMBINEE DE COMBUSTION ET DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ BRULES | [1995/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1994 | Translation filed | 26.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 31.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3037943 ; | [A]DE3924908 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |